There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 648) making appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 31) making further continuing appropriations for the Department of Homeland Security for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/23/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 190 (Roll no. 47).(text: CR H1012-1013)
01/22/2019The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-4, by Mr. Morelle.
01/22/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
01/23/2019-1:57pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/23/2019-1:57pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 190 (Roll no. 47). (text: CR H1012-1013)
01/23/2019-1:45pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1023)
01/23/2019-1:19pmPOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 61, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption until a time to be announced.
01/23/2019-1:19pmThe previous question was ordered without objection.
01/23/2019-12:25pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 61.
01/23/2019-12:23pmConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1012-1022)
01/22/2019Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 4.
01/22/2019-7:17pmRule provides for consideration of H.R. 648 and H.J. Res. 31 under closed rules with one hour of debate for each measure. Rule provides for consideration of motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of February 1, 2019
01/22/2019The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-4, by Mr. Morelle.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules01/22/2019 Reported original measure H. Rept. 116-4

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.61. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (01/23/2019)

This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.R. 648 (Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2019) and H.J.Res. 31 (FY2019 Department of Homeland Security appropriations).

The resolution makes it in order at any time through the legislative day of February 1, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.

In addition, the resolution waives a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of any resolution reported from the Committee on Rules through the legislative day of January 30, 2019, on the same day it is presented to the House, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for FY2019.