There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Route 66 Centennial Commission, to direct the Secretary of Transportation to prepare a plan on the preservation needs of Route 66, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/06/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 22 (Roll no. 67).(text: CR H1374-1375)
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
02/07/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
02/06/2019-2:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/06/2019-2:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 399 - 22 (Roll no. 67). (text: CR H1374-1375)
02/06/2019-2:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1377-1378)
02/06/2019-1:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/06/2019-12:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 66.
02/06/2019-12:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1374-1377)
02/06/2019-12:50pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/03/2019 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works02/07/2019 Referred to

As of 04/26/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.66 - Route 66 Centennial Commission Act.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.66. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (02/06/2019)

Route 66 Centennial Commission Act

(Sec. 3) This bill establishes the Route 66 Centennial Commission to honor highway Route 66 on the occasion of its centennial anniversary.

(Sec. 4) The bill sets forth the duties of the commission, its membership, powers, and reporting requirements.

(Sec. 9) The Department of Transportation shall prepare a plan on the preservation needs of Route 66.

(Sec. 10) The commission shall terminate not later than June 30, 2027.