There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

USA FREEDOM Reauthorization Act of 2020

Short Titles as Introduced

USA FREEDOM Reauthorization Act of 2020

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 to prohibit the production of certain business records, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/11/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 278 - 136 (Roll no. 98).
03/10/2020Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/16/2020SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S1753)
03/16/2020SenateMotion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S1748)
03/12/2020SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S1735)
03/12/2020SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S1735)
03/12/2020SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 440.
03/11/2020SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
03/11/2020-5:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/11/2020-5:15pmHouseH.Amdt.814 On agreeing to the Buck amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 35 - 376 (Roll no. 99).
03/11/2020-5:05pmHouseH.Amdt.814 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Buck. (consideration: CR H1637; text: CR H1637)
03/11/2020-5:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/11/2020-5:05pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 278 - 136 (Roll no. 98). (text: CR H1622-1627)
03/11/2020-4:22pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/11/2020-3:47pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 6172.
03/11/2020-3:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6172.
03/11/2020-3:14pmHouseRule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, H.R. 2486 and H.R. 6172. Resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, and H.R. 6172. For S.J. Res. 68, the resolution provides for 1 hour of debate and 1 motion to commit. For the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, the question will be divided and each portion will have 1 hour of debate. H.R. 6172 will have 1 hour ofdebate and 1 motion to recommit with or without instructions.
03/11/2020-3:14pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 891. (consideration: CR H1622-1637)
03/11/2020-2:00pmHouseRule H. Res. 891 passed House.
03/10/2020-7:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 891 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, H.R. 2486 and H.R. 6172. Resolution provides for consideration of S.J. Res. 68, the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, and H.R. 6172. For S.J. Res. 68, the resolution provides for 1 hour of debate and 1 motion to commit. For the Senate amendment to H.R. 2486, the question will be divided and each portion will have 1 hour of debate. H.R. 6172 will have 1 hour ofdebate and 1 motion to recommit with or without instructions.
03/10/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/10/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/10/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/10/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/10/2020HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/10/2020

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/10/2020 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent)03/10/2020 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform03/10/2020 Referred to
House Homeland Security03/10/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6172. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/2020)

USA FREEDOM Reauthorization Act of 2020

This bill reauthorizes through December 1, 2023, provisions related to intelligence gathering under the Foreign Intelligence and Surveillance Act (FISA) and amends FISA-related provisions.

The Federal Bureau of Investigation may not seek certain FISA-authorized orders to obtain (1) call detail records on an ongoing basis, (2) a tangible thing where a person has a reasonable expectation of privacy and a warrant would typically be required, or (3) cellular or GPS location information.

In applications for certain FISA-authorized orders to obtain information or conduct surveillance, the applicant must certify that the Department of Justice (DOJ) has received any information that might raise doubts about the application. The bill imposes additional requirements on FISA-authorized orders targeting a (1) U.S. person, or (2) federal elected official or candidate.

The bill increases criminal penalties for violations related to electronic surveillance conducted under color of law or false statements made to the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court (FISA court).

The bill broadens the criteria for when a FISA court decision shall be declassified and requires the declassification review and release of such opinions within 180 days of an opinion being issued.

The bill broadens the FISA court's authority to appoint an amicus curiae (an outside party that assists in consideration of a case) and expands such amici's powers, such as the power to ask the court to review a decision.

Each agency that submits applications to the FISA court shall appoint an officer responsible for compliance with FISA requirements.