There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Bipartisan Budget Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Bipartisan Budget Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Bipartisan Budget Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Bipartisan Budget Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985, to establish a congressional budget for fiscal years 2020 and 2021, to temporarily suspend the debt limit, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
08/02/2019Became Public Law No: 116-37.
08/02/2019Signed by President.
08/01/2019Presented to President.
08/01/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 67 - 28. Record Vote Number: 262.
07/25/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 284 - 149 (Roll no. 511).(text: CR H7398-7401)
07/23/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
08/02/2019Became Public Law No: 116-37.
08/02/2019Signed by President.
08/01/2019HousePresented to President.
08/01/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 67 - 28. Record Vote Number: 262.
08/01/2019SenateCloture on the measure invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 67 - 27. Record Vote Number: 261.
08/01/2019SenateS.Amdt.932 Amendment SA 932, under the order of 7/30/19, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 23 - 70. Record Vote Number: 260.
08/01/2019SenateS.Amdt.932 Amendment SA 932 proposed by Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S5287-5288; text: CR S5287) In the nature of a substitute.
08/01/2019SenateCloture motion on the measure presented in Senate. (CR S5288)
08/01/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5281, S5284-5289)
07/30/2019SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate.
07/29/2019SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate.
07/29/2019SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S5125)
07/29/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 165, pursuant to the order of July 25, 2019.
07/25/2019-5:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2019-5:28pmHouseH.Amdt.605 On agreeing to the Massie amendment to the title (A001) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 384 (Roll no. 512).
07/25/2019-5:12pmHouseH.Amdt.605 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Massie. (consideration: CR H7440; text: CR H7440)
07/25/2019-5:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2019-5:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 284 - 149 (Roll no. 511). (text: CR H7398-7401)
07/25/2019-4:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7439-7440)
07/25/2019-3:14pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3877, the Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 3877 and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Yarmuth demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
07/25/2019-3:13pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
07/25/2019-2:02pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3877.
07/25/2019-2:01pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549 under closed rules. Resolution also waives clause 6(a) of Rule XIII, requiring a two-thirds vote waiver to consider a rule on the same day it is reported from the Rules Committee against any resolution reported through the legislative day of July 26, 2019.
07/25/2019-2:01pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 519. (consideration: CR H7398-7409)
07/24/2019-9:38pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 519 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3877 and H.R. 549 under closed rules. Resolution also waives clause 6(a) of Rule XIII, requiring a two-thirds vote waiver to consider a rule on the same day it is reported from the Rules Committee against any resolution reported through the legislative day of July 26, 2019.
07/23/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/23/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/23/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/23/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 07/23/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget07/23/2019 Referred to
House Rules07/23/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/23/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3877. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/2019)

Bipartisan Budget Act of 2019

This bill increases discretionary spending limits, suspends the debt limit, and modifies budget enforcement procedures.

The bill increases the FY2020 and FY2021 discretionary spending limits for defense and nondefense spending. The bill also (1) specifies limits for Overseas Contingency Operations funding, which is exempt from discretionary spending limits; and (2) requires the FY2020 discretionary spending limits to be adjusted to accommodate specified funding for the 2020 Census.

The bill suspends the public debt limit through July 31, 2021. On August 1, 2021, the limit will be increased to accommodate obligations issued during the suspension period.

The bill also includes provisions that

  • set forth procedures for enforcing spending and revenue levels consistent with this bill as if they were included in congressional budget resolutions for FY2020 and FY2021;
  • specify limits on advance appropriations;
  • extend the sequestration (automatic spending cuts) for certain mandatory spending programs through FY2029;
  • extend the authority to collect certain customs user fees through FY2029;
  • extend and modify Senate points of order regarding advance appropriations, certain changes in mandatory programs (CHIMPs), and designations of funds for Overseas Contingency Operations; and
  • reset the balances on the Pay-As-You-Go (PAYGO) scorecards established by the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.