There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act

Short Titles as Introduced

U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to establish uniform processes for medical screening of individuals interdicted between ports of entry, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 184 (Roll no. 552).(text: CR H8032)
09/18/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-211.
06/27/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date
09/26/2019-5:22pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-5:22pmOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 184 (Roll no. 552). (text: CR H8032)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-5:13pmOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 213 (Roll no. 551).
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-5:05pmThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-4:55pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Green (TN) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back with an amendment to change the effective date of secion 3 to September 30, 2027.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-4:55pmMr. Green (TN) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Homeland Security. (text: CR H8038)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-4:54pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8038-8041)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-3:59pmPOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.R. 3525.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-3:59pmThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-3:12pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3525.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-3:11pmRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2019-3:11pmConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 577. (consideration: CR H8032-8037)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2019-7:28pmRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 577 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2019Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 167.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/18/2019Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-211.
07/17/2019Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/17/2019Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/27/2019Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/2019Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/27/2019 Referred to
07/17/2019 Markup by
09/18/2019 Reported by H. Rept. 116-211

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3525. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (09/26/2019)

U.S. Border Patrol Medical Screening Standards Act

The bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to (1) research and report to Congress new approaches to improve procedures for providing medical screening of individuals interdicted by U.S. Customs and Border Protection between ports of entry and recommend any necessary corrective actions, and (2) establish an electronic health record system containing the records of individuals in DHS custody that can be accessed by all relevant DHS departments.