There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Homebuyer Assistance Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Homebuyer Assistance Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Housing Act to authorize State-licensed appraisers to conduct appraisals in connection with mortgages insured by the FHA and to require compliance with the existing appraiser education requirement, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/10/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 5 (Roll no. 519).(text: CR H7572)
05/20/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/11/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
09/10/2019-3:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/10/2019-3:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 5 (Roll no. 519). (text: CR H7572)
09/10/2019-3:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7585-7586)
09/10/2019-1:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/10/2019-1:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2852.
09/10/2019-1:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7572-7573)
09/10/2019-1:15pmHouseMr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/11/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported Without Recommendation (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/11/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/20/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
05/20/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/27/2019
Rep. Taylor, Van [R-TX-3] 09/09/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services05/20/2019 Referred to
07/11/2019 Markup by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs09/11/2019 Referred to

As of 09/20/2019 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2852 - Homebuyer Assistance Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2852. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/2019)

Homebuyer Assistance Act of 2019

This bill modifies requirements for appraisers of Federal Housing Administration-insured mortgages. Currently, an appraiser must be certified by certain state or national entities. The bill removes the national entities from the list of approved certification entities and allows an appraiser to be state-licensed rather than state-certified to meet requirements. The bill also provides specified educational requirements for appraisers.