There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Department of the Treasury Appropriations Act, 2019
  • District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Executive Office of the President Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Judiciary Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2019

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Department of the Treasury Appropriations Act, 2019
  • District of Columbia Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Executive Office of the President Appropriations Act, 2019
  • Judiciary Appropriations Act, 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making appropriations for financial services and general government for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
01/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 188 (Roll no. 21).
01/08/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/10/2019SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 9.
01/09/2019SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
01/09/2019-5:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/09/2019-5:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 188 (Roll no. 21). (text: CR H312-331)
01/09/2019-5:01pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 227 (Roll no. 20).
01/09/2019-4:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H346-347)
01/09/2019-3:17pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Graves (GA) motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Graves (GA) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
01/09/2019-3:17pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
01/09/2019-3:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Graves (GA) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to increase the Office of Terrorism and Financial Intelligence Salaries and Expenses account by $2 million and to decrease the General Services Administration Real Property Activities Federal Buildings Fund by a similar amount.
01/09/2019-3:09pmHouseMr. Graves (GA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Appropriations.
01/09/2019-3:09pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/09/2019-2:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 264.
01/09/2019-2:15pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 264, H.R. 265, H.R. 266 and H.R. 267. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rule provides one hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows one motion to commit on each bill. The rule waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of January 15, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
01/09/2019-2:15pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 28. (consideration: CR H312-338)
01/08/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
01/08/2019-7:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 28 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 264, H.R. 265, H.R. 266 and H.R. 267. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rule provides one hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows one motion to commit on each bill. The rule waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of January 15, 2019, relating to a measure making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
01/08/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/08/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.264. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/08/2019)

Financial Services and General Government Appropriations Act, 2019

This bill provides FY2019 appropriations for several federal departments and agencies, including

  • the Department of the Treasury,
  • the Executive Office of the President,
  • the judiciary,
  • the District of Columbia, and
  • several independent agencies.

The independent agencies funded in the bill include

  • the Administrative Conference of the United States,
  • the Commodity Futures Trading Commission,
  • the Consumer Product Safety Commission,
  • the Election Assistance Commission,
  • the Federal Communications Commission,
  • the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation,
  • the Federal Election Commission,
  • the Federal Labor Relations Authority,
  • the Federal Trade Commission,
  • the General Services Administration,
  • the Harry S. Truman Scholarship Fund,
  • the Merit Systems Protection Board,
  • Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Foundation,
  • the National Archives and Records Administration,
  • the National Credit Union Administration,
  • the Office of Government Ethics,
  • the Office Personnel Management,
  • the Office of Special Counsel,
  • the Postal Regulatory Commission,
  • the Privacy and Civil Liberties Oversight Board,
  • the Securities and Exchange Commission,
  • the Selective Service System,
  • the Small Business Administration,
  • the U.S. Postal Service, and
  • the U.S. Tax Court.

The bill also sets forth requirements and restrictions for using funds provided by this and other appropriations Acts.