There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Expanding Contracting Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Expanding Contracting Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to eliminate the inclusion of option years in the award price for sole source contracts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
01/16/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 6 (Roll no. 36).(text: CR 1/14/2019 H528-529)
01/03/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
01/17/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
01/16/2019-2:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/16/2019-2:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 6 (Roll no. 36). (text: CR 1/14/2019 H528-529)
01/16/2019-2:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H626)
01/14/2019-4:48pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/14/2019-4:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 190.
01/14/2019-4:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H528-531)
01/14/2019-4:37pmHouseMs. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/03/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
01/03/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/03/2019
Rep. Harder, Josh [D-CA-10] 01/14/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business01/03/2019 Referred to
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.