There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 to promote energy efficiency via information and computing technologies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 23 (Roll no. 515).(text: CR H7540-7541)
02/28/2019Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/10/2019SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/09/2019-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/09/2019-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 23 (Roll no. 515). (text: CR H7540-7541)
09/09/2019-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7546-7547)
09/09/2019-4:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/09/2019-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1420.
09/09/2019-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7540-7541)
09/09/2019-4:30pmHouseMr. Rush moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/01/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/28/2019HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/28/2019
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/28/2019
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/11/2019
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-1] 06/10/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/28/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy03/01/2019 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1420. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2019)

Energy Efficient Government Technology Act

This bill sets forth requirements with respect to increasing the energy efficiency of information technologies and data centers within the federal government.

Specifically, this bill requires each federal agency to coordinate with the Office of Management and Budget, the Department of Energy (DOE), and the Environmental Protection Agency to develop an implementation strategy for the maintenance, purchase, and use of energy-efficient and energy-saving information technologies at or for federally owned and operated facilities.

DOE must (1) maintain a data center energy practitioner program that leads to the certification of energy practitioners qualified to evaluate the energy usage and efficiency opportunities in federally owned and operated data centers; and (2) establish an open data initiative to make information about federal data center energy usage available and accessible in a manner that encourages data center innovation, optimization, and consolidation.