There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Nordic Museum Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Nordic Museum Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Nordic Museum Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Nordic Museum Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the Nordic Museum in Seattle, Washington, as the "National Nordic Museum", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
09/10/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-931.
07/16/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-303.
06/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3264; text: CR S3264)
05/23/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
05/16/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/10/2018HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
09/10/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-931.
09/05/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/05/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/05/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/16/2018SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-303.
06/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/07/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/07/2018-12:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/07/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3264; text: CR S3264)
05/23/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433.
05/23/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
05/17/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/16/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/23/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/16/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
05/23/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-303
House Natural Resources06/07/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Markup by
09/10/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-931
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/08/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.2857.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2857. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (09/10/2018)

National Nordic Museum Act

(Sec. 3) This bill designates the Nordic Museum at 2655 N.W. Market Street in Seattle, Washington, as the "National Nordic Museum."