There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide access to and manage the distribution of excess or surplus property to veteran-owned small businesses.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-416.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 1 (Roll no. 454).(text: CR H10402)
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7334; text: CR S7334)
12/05/2018By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-414.
10/11/2018Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/16/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-416.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 1 (Roll no. 454). (text: CR H10402)
12/20/2018-2:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10434-10435)
12/20/2018-12:19pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-12:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2679.
12/20/2018-12:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10401-10402)
12/20/2018-12:15pmHouseMr. Marshall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/10/2018-5:47pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/10/2018-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7334; text: CR S7334)
12/05/2018SenateBy Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-414.
10/11/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
10/11/2018SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/11/2018SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/16/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 04/16/2018
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 04/16/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/22/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/12/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship04/16/2018 Referred to
10/11/2018 Markup by
10/11/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-414

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2679. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-416 (01/03/2019)

Veterans Small Business Enhancement Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Small Business Act to direct the Small Business Administration (SBA) to give access to and manage the distribution of U.S-owned surplus property, pursuant to a memorandum of agreement between the SBA, the General Services Administration, and the head of the state agency for surplus properties, to small businesses owned and controlled by veterans. This includes access to foreign excess property returned to a state for handling as surplus property.