There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Precision Agriculture Connectivity Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Precision Agriculture Connectivity Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Federal Communications Commission to establish a task force for meeting the connectivity and technology needs of precision agriculture in the United States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7367-7368; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7367-7368)
10/02/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-342.
01/25/2018Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
12/10/2018-4:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/10/2018-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7367-7368; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7367-7368)
10/02/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 615.
10/02/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-342.
04/25/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/25/2018SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/25/2018 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by
10/02/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-342

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2343. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (10/02/2018)

Precision Agriculture Connectivity Act of 2018

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to establish the Task Force for Reviewing the Connectivity and Technology Needs of Precision Agriculture in the United States. The task force must identify current gaps in the availability of broadband Internet access service on agricultural land and recommend policies to expand its deployment.

The Department of Agriculture and the FCC shall jointly submit to the task force a list of all federal programs or resources available for the expansion of broadband Internet access service on unserved agricultural land.

The FCC shall renew the task force every two years until it terminates on January 1, 2025.