There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal CIO Authorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal CIO Authorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 36 of title 44, United States Code, to make certain changes relating to electronic Government services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/30/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 425).
10/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-987.
09/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
12/03/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/30/2018-10:28amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2018-10:28amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 425).
11/30/2018-10:04amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9747)
11/29/2018-6:00pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Comer objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
11/29/2018-5:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6901.
11/29/2018-5:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9723-9725; text of measure as reported in House: CR H9723-9725)
11/29/2018-5:54pmHouseMr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/12/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 771.
10/12/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-987.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/27/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
09/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
09/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/26/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform09/26/2018 Referred to
09/27/2018 Markup by
10/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-987
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/03/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6901.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6901. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/26/2018)

Federal CIO Authorization Act of 2018

This bill reorganizes Office of Management and Budget (OMB) information technology (IT) activities and establishes new IT reporting requirements.

The bill renames (1) the Office of E-Government & Information Technology (E-Gov) as the Office of the Federal Chief Information Officer (Federal CIO), and (2) the E-Government Fund as the Federal IT Fund. The office shall be headed by a Federal Chief Information Officer who shall report directly to the Director of OMB (currently, the head of E-Gov reports to the Deputy Director). There is established in the office a Federal Chief Information Security Officer.

Agencies must report IT expenditures to the Federal CIO. The Federal CIO must publish timely, searchable, computer-readable data on agency IT expenditures, projects, and programs.

The Federal CIO shall submit to Congress a proposal for consolidating IT across the federal government and increasing the use of shared services.