There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rename the Oyster Bay National Wildlife Refuge as the Congressman Lester Wolff National Wildlife Refuge.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 4, 2 Present (Roll no. 416).(text: CR H9479-9480)
10/12/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-986.
06/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
11/13/2018-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2018-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 385 - 4, 2 Present (Roll no. 416). (text: CR H9479-9480)
11/13/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9498)
11/13/2018-4:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/13/2018-4:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6064.
11/13/2018-4:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H0479-9480)
11/13/2018-4:19pmHouseMr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/12/2018HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
10/12/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-986.
09/26/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/26/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
06/14/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/08/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/08/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/08/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
10/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-986
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/14/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works11/14/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6064.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6064. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2018)

This bill designates the Oyster Bay National Wildlife Refuge near Oyster Bay, New York, as the "Congressman Lester Wolff National Wildlife Refuge."