There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2650 North Doctor Martin Luther King Jr. Drive in Milwaukee, Wisconsin, shall be known and designated as the "Vel R. Phillips Post Office Building".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2650 North Doctor Martin Luther King Drive in Milwaukee, Wisconsin, as the "Vel R. Phillips Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/06/2018Became Public Law No: 115-294.
12/06/2018Signed by President.
11/27/2018Presented to President.
11/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7064)
09/28/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
09/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H8249)
09/13/2018Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/06/2018Became Public Law No: 115-294.
12/06/2018Signed by President.
11/27/2018HousePresented to President.
11/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/15/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7064)
09/28/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 604.
09/28/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
09/26/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/13/2018-4:09pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2018-4:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2018-4:09pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8249)
09/13/2018-4:09pmHouseH.Amdt.965 On agreeing to the Russell amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/13/2018-4:09pmHouseH.Amdt.965 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Russell. (consideration: CR H8249; text: CR H8249)
09/13/2018-4:09pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8249)
09/13/2018HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
09/13/2018-4:08pmHouseMr. Russell asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
05/23/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/11/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/11/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform05/11/2018 Referred to
05/23/2018 Markup by
09/13/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/17/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
09/28/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5784.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5784. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-294 (12/06/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2650 North Doctor Martin Luther King Jr. Drive in Milwaukee, Wisconsin, as the "Vel R. Phillips Post Office Building."