There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Engagement Center Authorities Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2017 to clarify certain responsibilities of the Global Engagement Center of the Department of State, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
05/16/2018Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3989)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/09/2018Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
05/09/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/09/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/08/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/07/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/07/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/08/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/08/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/10/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/07/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
House Armed Services05/07/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities05/08/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5681. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/07/2018)

Global Engagement Center Authorities Act of 2018

This bill revises provisions relating to the Global Engagement Center and its role in countering foreign and non-state propaganda and disinformation efforts aimed at undermining the policies, security, or stability of the United States and its allies and partner states. It also modifies the center's grant program for assisting specified entities in countering such propaganda and disinformation efforts. The Department of State shall brief Congress at least annually on the activities of the center.