There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Hack Your State Department Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Hack Your State Department Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of State to design and establish a Vulnerability Disclosure Program (VDP) to improve Department of State cybersecurity and a bug bounty program to identify and report vulnerabilities of internet-facing information technology of the Department of State, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8878-8879)
04/05/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
09/25/2018-10:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-10:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8878-8879)
09/25/2018-10:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5433.
09/25/2018-10:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8878-8880)
09/25/2018-10:36pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/05/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/05/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 04/05/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/08/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/05/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations09/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5433.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5433. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/25/2018)

Hack Your State Department Act

This bill requires the Department of State to design, establish, and make publicly known a Vulnerability Disclosure Process to improve cybersecurity. The process requirements include: (1) identifying which information technology should be included, (2) providing a readily available means of reporting discovered security vulnerabilities, and (3) identifying the offices and position that will be responsible for addressing security vulnerability disclosures.

The bill requires the State Department to establish a bug bounty pilot program to provide compensation for reports of previously unidentified security vulnerabilities of its internet-facing information technology.