There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide outer burial receptacles for remains buried in National Parks, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
06/15/2018Became Public Law No: 115-184.
06/15/2018Signed by President.
06/05/2018Presented to President.
05/24/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2942)
05/07/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 167).(text: CR H3753)
01/30/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
06/15/2018Became Public Law No: 115-184.
06/15/2018Signed by President.
06/05/2018HousePresented to President.
05/25/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/24/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2942)
05/08/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 399.
05/07/2018-6:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/07/2018-6:55pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 388 - 0 (Roll no. 167). (text: CR H3753)
05/07/2018-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3761-3762)
05/07/2018-4:42pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/07/2018-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4910.
05/07/2018-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3753-3755)
05/07/2018-4:31pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/20/2018HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
02/01/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/30/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/30/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/30/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/30/2018 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
House Natural Resources01/30/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/01/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4910. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-184 (06/15/2018)

Veterans Cemetery Benefit Correction Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of the Interior to provide outer burial receptacles for veterans' remains buried in a national cemetery administered by the National Park Service. (An outer burial receptacle is a container, such as a grave liner or a burial vault, that protects a casket in the ground and prevents the grave from sinking.)

Interior may provide reimbursement for outer burial receptacles other than grave liners but may require survivors to pay: (1) the costs by which such burial receptacle exceeds the costs of a grave liner, and (2) related administrative costs.