There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize early repayment of obligations to the Bureau of Reclamation within the Northport Irrigation District in the State of Nebraska.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/10/2019Became Public Law No: 115-429.
01/10/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2018Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8034)
09/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 1 (Roll no. 396).(text: CR H8144)
05/22/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-700.
12/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
01/10/2019Became Public Law No: 115-429.
01/10/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/22/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/22/2018SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8034)
09/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/12/2018-7:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2018-7:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 1 (Roll no. 396). (text: CR H8144)
09/12/2018-7:11pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8158-8159)
09/12/2018-5:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/12/2018-5:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4689.
09/12/2018-5:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8144-8145)
09/12/2018-5:10pmHouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/22/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 542.
05/22/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-700.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
01/02/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/19/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
12/19/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources12/19/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/22/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-700
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans01/02/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/17/2018 Referred to
12/22/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4689.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4689. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-429 (01/10/2019)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes any landowner within the Northport Irrigation District in Nebraska to repay, at any time, the construction costs of project facilities allocated to the landowner's land within the district. Upon discharge in full of the obligation for repayment of all such costs, the parcels of land may not be subject to the ownership and full-cost pricing limitations under federal reclamation law. The Department of the Interior, upon request, must provide to the landowner who has repaid such costs in full a certificate acknowledging that the landholding is free of such limitations.