There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

International Insurance Standards Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

International Insurance Standards Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

International Insurance Standards Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve the State-based system of insurance regulation and provide greater oversight of and transparency on international insurance standards setting processes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
07/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6007-6008)
07/03/2018Committee on Rules discharged.
07/03/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-804, Part I.
12/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/11/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
07/10/2018-4:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/10/2018-4:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6007-6008)
07/10/2018-3:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4537.
07/10/2018-3:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6007-6010)
07/10/2018-3:53pmHouseMr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/03/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 623.
07/03/2018HouseCommittee on Rules discharged.
07/03/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-804, Part I.
12/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 4.
12/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/04/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services12/04/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
07/03/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-804
House Rules12/04/2017 Referred to
07/03/2018 Discharged from
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs07/11/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4537. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/10/2018)

International Insurance Standards Act of 2018

(Sec. 3) This bill prohibits parties representing the federal government in an international insurance agreement from agreeing to any standard unless it recognizes the existing U.S. system of regulation as satisfying that standard.

(Sec. 4) In developing international insurance standards, the parties must coordinate with state insurance regulators.

(Sec. 5) Parties representing the United States in such proceedings must consult with and notify Congress regarding the intention to participate in the negotiations, the nature and objectives of the negotiations, and the details of the agreement.

(Sec. 6) Before entering into any agreement, the parties must report to Congress regarding the implementation and impact of the agreement.

(Sec. 7) The bill amends the Federal Insurance Office Act of 2010 to modify requirements for an international agreement entered into by the Department of the Treasury's Federal Insurance Office. Such an agreement must only apply on a prospective basis. In developing an agreement, the parties must coordinate with state insurance regulators. Congress has the power to review and disapprove by joint resolution any agreement.