There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

North Texas Water Supply Security Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To limit claims under Federal law seeking judicial review of any environmental impact statement, environmental review, or authorization for the Lower Bois d'Arc Creek Reservoir Project in Fannin County, Texas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
06/13/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 11.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/13/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/12/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law
12/13/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/16/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 11/16/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/16/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/12/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/16/2017 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law12/13/2017 Referred to
04/12/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4423. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/2017)

North Texas Water Supply Security Act of 2017

This bill bars claims arising under federal law seeking judicial review of any environmental impact statement, environmental review, or authorization issued by an agency for the Lower Bois d'Arc Creek Reservoir Project in Fannin County, Texas, unless such claims meet certain procedural requirements.