There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

VA Billing Accountability Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

VA Billing Accountability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Billing Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to waive the requirement of certain veterans to make copayments for hospital care and medical services in the case of an error by the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4247)
05/18/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-681.
04/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-3:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-3:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4247)
05/21/2018-3:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1972.
05/21/2018-3:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4247-4248)
05/21/2018-3:00pmHouseMr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 524.
05/18/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-681.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/26/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
04/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/06/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/02/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/17/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/28/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 11/29/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/05/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 12/05/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 12/05/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/05/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/05/2017
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 12/21/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 12/21/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/21/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 12/21/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/21/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 12/21/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 12/21/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/21/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 12/21/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/21/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/05/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 01/10/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/22/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 01/22/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/22/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/22/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 01/22/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/25/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 01/25/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/25/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/06/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/06/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 02/15/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/01/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 03/06/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 03/06/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/09/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/16/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 04/26/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/27/2018
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/10/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/06/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-681
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/07/2017 Referred to
09/26/2017 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1972.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1972. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/21/2018)

VA Billing Accountability Act

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to waive the requirement that a veteran make copayments for medication, hospital care, nursing home care, or medical services if the veteran received copayment notification more than 180 days after the medical service or receipt of medication and such delay was caused by VA error.

In requiring a veteran to make a copayment for medical services, the VA shall notify the veteran within 180 days (18 months in the case of a non-VA facility) of the service. If the VA does not provide such notification, it may not collect the payment unless the veteran is provided with an opportunity to apply for a waiver or establish a payment plan.

The VA shall review and improve its copayment billing internal controls and notification procedures.