There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Law Enforcement Museum Act to allow the Museum to acquire, receive, possess, collect, ship, transport, import, and display firearms, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/17/2018Became Public Law No: 115-321.
12/17/2018Signed by President.
12/11/2018Presented to President.
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7332)
05/15/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3954)
02/08/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-548.
03/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
12/17/2018Became Public Law No: 115-321.
12/17/2018Signed by President.
12/11/2018HousePresented to President.
12/06/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7332)
05/16/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/15/2018-5:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2018-5:37pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3954)
05/15/2018-5:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1417.
05/15/2018-5:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3954-3955)
05/15/2018-5:30pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/08/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 411.
02/08/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-548.
01/17/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
01/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/17/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
03/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/07/2017 Referred to
01/17/2018 Markup by
02/08/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-548
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/16/2017 Referred to
01/17/2018 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary05/16/2018 Referred to
12/06/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1417.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1417. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-321 (12/17/2018)

National Law Enforcement Museum Exhibits Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Law Enforcement Museum Act to permit the National Law Enforcement Museum in Washington, DC, to acquire, receive, possess, collect, ship, transport, import, and display firearms in fulfilling the museum's purposes.