There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2015

Short Titles as Reported to House

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2015

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2015

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve enforcement efforts related to prescription drug diversion and abuse, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/21/2015Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2329)
04/20/2015Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
04/20/2015Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-85, Part I.
01/22/2015Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
04/22/2015SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
04/21/2015-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/21/2015-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2329)
04/21/2015-3:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 471.
04/21/2015-3:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2329-2332)
04/21/2015-3:56pmHouseMrs. Blackburn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/20/2015HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 63.
04/20/2015HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
04/20/2015HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-85, Part I.
02/19/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/23/2015HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/22/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/22/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/22/2015HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/22/2015HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/22/2015
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/22/2015
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/22/2015
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/11/2015
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/11/2015
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 03/25/2015

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/22/2015 Referred to
04/20/2015 Reported by H. Rept. 114-85
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health01/23/2015 Referred to
House Judiciary01/22/2015 Referred to
04/20/2015 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/19/2015 Referred to
Senate Judiciary04/22/2015 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.471. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/21/2015)

Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2015

(Sec. 2) Amends the Controlled Substances Act to define: (1) "factors as may be relevant to and consistent with the public health and safety," for purposes of the Attorney General's determination of whether registering an applicant to manufacture or distribute a controlled substance in schedule I or II is in the public interest, as factors that are relevant to and consistent with the findings of such Act; and (2) "imminent danger to the public health or safety," for purposes of the suspension of such a registration, to mean that in the absence of an immediate suspension order, controlled substances will continue to be distributed or dispensed by a registrant who knows or should know through fulfilling the obligations of the registrant under this Act that the dispensing is outside the usual course of professional practice, the distribution or dispensing poses a present or foreseeable risk of adverse health consequences or death due to the abuse or misuse of the controlled substances, or the controlled substances will continue to be diverted outside of legitimate distribution channels.

Requires an order to show cause as to why such a registration should not be denied, revoked, or suspended to: (1) contain a statement of the basis for the denial, revocation, or suspension, including specific citations to any laws or regulations alleged to be violated; (2) direct the applicant or registrant to appear before the Attorney General at a specific place and time within 30 days after receipt of the order; and (3) notify the applicant or registrant of the opportunity to submit a corrective action plan on or before such appearance. Requires the Attorney General, upon review of any such plan, to determine whether denial, revocation, or suspension proceedings should be discontinued or deferred for purposes of modifications to such plan. Makes such requirements inapplicable to the issuance of an immediate suspension order.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Commissioner of Food and Drugs and the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, to submit a report identifying: (1) obstacles to legitimate patient access to controlled substances; (2) issues with diversion of controlled substances; and (3) how collaboration between federal, state, local, and tribal law enforcement agencies and the pharmaceutical industry can benefit patients and prevent diversion and abuse of controlled substances.