There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting States, Opening National Parks Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting States, Opening National Parks Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Treasury to reimburse States that use State funds to operate National Parks during the Federal Government shutdown, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/22/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-694.
10/11/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
12/22/2014Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/22/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-694.
12/04/2013Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/04/2013Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
11/21/2013Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation
10/18/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/11/2013Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/11/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (26)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/11/2013 Referred to
12/04/2013 Markup by
12/22/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-694
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation10/18/2013 Referred to
11/21/2013 Hearings by
12/04/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3286. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (12/22/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Protecting States, Opening National Parks Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to reimburse any state for state funds expended for an activity conducted in FY2014 during the federal government shutdown that was necessary to operate and open to the public a National Park located, in whole or in part, within the state. Requires any such activity to have been: (1) authorized under federal law, (2) conducted in a manner and at a level not substantially greater in scope or cost than how the activity would have been conducted by the federal government, and (3) not a settlement of or defense against a claim of liability on the part of the state.