There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Tribal General Welfare Exclusion Act of 2014

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Tribal General Welfare Exclusion Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Tribal General Welfare Exclusion Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Tribal General Welfare Exclusion Act of 2014

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify the treatment of general welfare benefits provided by Indian tribes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-168. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2014Signed by President.
09/23/2014Presented to President.
09/18/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5862)
09/16/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7600)
08/02/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-168. (TXT | PDF)
09/26/2014Signed by President.
09/23/2014HousePresented to President.
09/19/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/18/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5862)
09/17/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/16/2014-9:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/16/2014-9:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7600)
09/16/2014-9:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3043.
09/16/2014-9:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7599-7603)
09/16/2014-9:05pmHouseMr. Nunes moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
08/02/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/02/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/08/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/06/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/28/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/22/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/08/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/10/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/11/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/16/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/16/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means08/02/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3043. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-168 (09/26/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here, with an updated short title.)

Tribal General Welfare Exclusion Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income, for income tax purposes, the value of an Indian general welfare benefit. Defines "Indian general welfare benefit" as any payment made or services provided to or on behalf of a member of an Indian tribe under an Indian tribal government program if: (1) such program is administered under specified guidelines and does not discriminate in favor of members of the governing body of the Indian tribe; and (2) the program benefits are available to any tribal member, are for the promotion of general welfare, are not lavish or extravagant, and are not compensation for services.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) establish a Tribal Advisory Committee to advise the Secretary on the taxation of Indians, (2) establish and require training and education for Internal Revenue Service (IRS) field agents on federal Indian law and the implementation of this Act, and (3) suspend audits and examinations of Indian tribal governments and members of Indian tribes and waive any interest or tax penalties related to the exclusion from gross income of Indian general welfare benefits.