There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Corporate Estimated Tax Shift Act of 2009

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Corporate Estimated Tax Shift Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Corporate Estimated Tax Shift Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
07/28/2009Became Public Law No: 111-42. (TXT | PDF)
07/28/2009Signed by President.
07/27/2009Presented to President.
07/23/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8060-8061)
07/21/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8460)
06/04/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/28/2009Became Public Law No: 111-42. (TXT | PDF)
07/28/2009Signed by President.
07/27/2009HousePresented to President.
07/24/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/23/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8060-8061)
07/22/2009SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/21/2009-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/21/2009-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8460)
07/21/2009-6:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 56.
07/21/2009-6:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8460-8462)
07/21/2009-6:41pmHouseMr. Levin moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended.
06/04/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/04/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (29)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/04/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.56. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-42 (07/28/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 21, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Title I: Approving the Renewal of Import Restrictions Contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003 - (Sec. 101) Amends the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003 to renew, for three years, the President's authority to ban the import of Burmese products.

(Sec. 102) Approves the renewal of certain import restrictions contained in the Act.

Deems this resolution a renewal resolution.

(Sec. 103) Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend from January 31, 2018, through February 7, 2018, certain customs fees for the processing of merchandise entered into the United States.

(Sec. 104) States that this resolution shall take effect upon its enactment or July 26, 2009, whichever occurs first.

Title II: Time for Payment of Corporate Estimated Taxes - Corporate Estimated Tax Shift Act of 2009 - (Sec. 202) Makes inapplicable to any installment of corporate estimated tax otherwise due after December 31, 2009, the percentages of estimated tax liability of corporations with at least $1 billion in assets required by the Tax Increase Prevention and Reconciliation Act of 2005 for the third quarters of 2010 through 2013.

Increases the estimated tax payments of such corporations in the third quarter of 2014 by .25%, and reduces the fourth quarter installment to reflect such increase.