There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2010

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To exclude from consideration as income under the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act of 1996 amounts received by a family from the Department of Veterans Affairs for service-related disabilities of a member of the family.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/12/2010Became Public Law No: 111-269. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2010Signed by President.
09/30/2010Presented to President.
09/27/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7556)
09/22/2010Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. With written report No. 111-299.
04/20/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2654)
09/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/12/2010Became Public Law No: 111-269. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2010Signed by President.
09/30/2010HousePresented to President.
09/28/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7556)
09/22/2010SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 579.
09/22/2010SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan without amendment. With written report No. 111-299.
06/30/2010SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/22/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
04/20/2010-2:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/20/2010-2:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2654)
04/20/2010-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3553.
04/20/2010-2:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2654-2656)
04/20/2010-2:22pmHouseMr. Cleaver moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/10/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
09/10/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/23/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/10/2009 Referred to
Senate Indian Affairs04/22/2010 Referred to
06/30/2010 Markup by
09/22/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-299

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3553. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-269 (10/12/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here, with an updated short title.)

Indian Veterans Housing Opportunity Act of 2010 - Amends the Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Act of 1996 to exclude from consideration as income any amounts received by a family from the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) as veterans' disability compensation or dependency and indemnity compensation for service-related disabilities of a member of the family.