There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Vessel Hull Design Protection Amendments of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Vessel Hull Design Protection Amendments of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Vessel Hull Design Protection Amendments of 2008

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Vessel Hull Design Protection Amendments of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 13 of title 17, United States Code (relating to the vessel hull design protection), to clarify the definitions of a hull and a deck.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/16/2008Became Public Law No: 110-434. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2008Signed by President.
10/07/2008Presented to President.
09/30/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10186)
07/22/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6740)
07/17/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/16/2008Became Public Law No: 110-434. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2008Signed by President.
10/07/2008HousePresented to President.
10/01/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10186)
08/01/2008SenateRead twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 931.
07/23/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/22/2008-2:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2008-2:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6740)
07/22/2008-2:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6531.
07/22/2008-2:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6740-6741)
07/22/2008-2:11pmHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/17/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
07/17/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/17/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/17/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.6531. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-434 (10/16/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Vessel Hull Design Protection Amendments of 2008 - Amends federal copyright law to specify that the design of a vessel's hull, deck, or combination of a hull and deck, including a plug or mold are protected (currently, only the design of the vessel hull is protected, including a plug or mold).

Requires that Department of Defense (DOD) rights in a registered design, including the right to build to such a design, be determined solely by provisions of federal Armed Forces law relating to rights in technical data or by the instrument under which the design was developed for the U.S. government.

Redefines "useful article" and "hull." Defines "deck" as the horizontal surface of the vessel that covers the hull, including exterior cabin and cockpit surfaces, and exclusive of masts, sails, yards, rigging, hardware, fixtures, and other attachments.