There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Boutique Fuel Reduction Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Clean Air Act to provide for a reduction in the number of boutique fuels, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/24/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/15/2008Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mrs. Drake. Petition No: 110-13. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/24/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/24/2007Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/24/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (88)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/21/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/14/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/21/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/03/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/03/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/03/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/03/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/03/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/09/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/09/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/12/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/26/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/16/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/24/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality05/24/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2493.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2493. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/2007)

Boutique Fuel Reduction Act of 2007 - Amends the Clean Air Act to add as "extreme and unusual circumstances that prevent the distribution of an adequate supply of fuel or fuel additives to consumers" under which the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) may temporarily waive a control or prohibition on the use of a fuel or fuel additive circumstances that are the result of unexpected problems with equipment necessary for transportation and delivery of fuel or fuel additives.

States that EPA shall have no authority, when considering a state implementation plan (SIP) or SIP revision, to approve any fuel included in such plan or revision if the effect of such approval increases the total number of fuels set forth on the published list of approved fuels (currently EPA does not have the authority to approve a fuel if it increases the total number of fuels approved as of September 1, 2004, in all SIPs).

Requires notice and opportunity for comment before the Administrator removes a fuel from the list. Requires EPA to remove a fuel from the list if such fuel has ceased to be included in an SIP or is identical to a federal fuel control or prohibition. Repeals provisions prohibiting EPA from reducing the total number of authorized fuels. Requires EPA to publish a revised list reflecting the reduction in the number of fuels. Deletes as a condition under which the Administrator's authority to approve a control or prohibition respecting any new fuel is limited that such new fuel will increase the total number of fuels on the list.