There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Anticounterfeiting Amendments of 2002

Short Titles as Introduced

Anticounterfeiting Amendments of 2002

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to prevent and punish counterfeiting and copyright piracy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/18/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/30/2002Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/18/2002Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 500.
Action By: Senate
07/18/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/18/2002Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/30/2002Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3562-3563)
Action By: Senate
04/30/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3561-3562)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (12)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/30/2002
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/09/2002
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/09/2002
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/11/2002
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/11/2002
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/11/2002
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/11/2002
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 04/30/2002 08/01/2002 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary04/30/2002 Referred to
07/18/2002 Markup by
07/18/2002 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.2395.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2395. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/18/2002)

Anticounterfeiting Amendments of 2002 - Amends the Federal criminal code to prohibit trafficking in an illicit authentication feature affixed to or embedded in a phonorecord, a copy of a computer program, a copy of a motion picture or other audiovisual work, or documentation and packaging.

Defines an "authentication feature" as any hologram, watermark, certification, symbol, code, image, sequence of numbers or letters, or other feature used by the respective copyright owner to verify that the product is not counterfeit or otherwise infringing of any copyright. Defines an "illicit"authentication feature as one that: (1) is genuine but has been tampered with or altered without the authorization of the copyright owner to induce a third party to reproduce or accept distribution of the product in violation of the rights of the copyright owner; (2) is genuine but has been or is intended to be distributed without the authorization of the copyright owner and not in connection with the lawfully made product for which it was intended; or (3) appears to be genuine but is not.

Authorizes an injured copyright owner to bring a civil action in an appropriate U.S. district court. Sets forth remedies for violations, including providing for the calculation of actual damages or the recovery of specified statutory damages.