There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Freedom to E-File Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom to E-File Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Department of Agriculture to establish an electronic filing and retrieval system to enable the public to file all required paperwork electronically with the Department and to have access to public information on farm programs, quarterly trade, economic, and production reports, and other similar information.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 106-565.
02/25/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
04/10/2000Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 310.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 106-565.
03/29/2000Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/29/2000Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/23/2000Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry
03/23/2000Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry
06/17/1999Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry
06/14/1999Favorable Executive Comment Received from USDA.
03/02/1999Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
03/02/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/25/1999Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/18/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/18/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/18/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/18/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/18/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/18/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/03/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/19/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/19/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/19/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/17/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/29/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/04/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/25/1999 Referred to
03/29/2000 Markup by
04/10/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-565
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition, and Forestry03/02/1999 Referred to
06/17/1999 Hearings by
03/23/2000 Markup by
03/23/2000 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.852. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (04/10/2000)

Freedom to E-File Act - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to establish an Internet-based filing and retrieval system to enable farmers and other persons to: (1) electronically file paperwork required by the Farm Service Agency, the Risk Management Agency, the Natural Resources Conservation Service, and certain rural development components of the Department of Agriculture; and (2) have electronic access to production agriculture information. Directs the Secretary to ensure system interoperability.

Sets forth implementation timetables.

Obligates amounts from such agencies' information technology funds for the filing and retrieval system.