There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mississippi Sound Restoration Act of 2000

Short Titles as Reported to House

Mississippi Sound Restoration Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Mississippi Sound Restoration Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to authorize funding to carry out certain water quality and barrier island restoration projects for the Mississippi Sound, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7480-7481)
09/12/2000Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-840.
03/28/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/13/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/12/2000-11:11pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2000-11:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2000-11:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7480-7481)
09/12/2000-11:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4104.
09/12/2000-11:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7480-7482)
09/12/2000-11:03pmHouseMr. LaTourette moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/12/2000HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 497.
09/12/2000HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-840.
07/26/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/26/2000HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
03/29/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/28/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/28/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/28/2000 Referred to
07/26/2000 Markup by
09/12/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-840
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment03/29/2000 Referred to
07/26/2000 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works09/13/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4104.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4104. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2000)

Mississippi Sound Restoration Act of 2000 - Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to add the Mississippi Sound in Mississippi to the list of estuaries to receive priority consideration for inclusion in the National Estuary Program (NEP).

Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to establish the Mississippi Sound Restoration Program within EPA. Authorizes the Administrator to make grants for restoration projects and studies and public education projects recommended by a management conference convened for the Sound under the NEP.

Directs the Administrator to assist the Council in developing a management plan for the restoration and protection of the Sound and to provide funding and oversight for voluntary restoration projects. Authorizes appropriations.

Expresses the sense of Congress that all recipients of grants under this Act shall abide by the Buy American Act.