Committees: H.R.4 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/04/1995 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources01/09/1995 Referred to
02/07/1995 Hearings by
02/15/1995 Markup by
02/15/1995 Reported by
House Banking and Financial Services01/04/1995 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity01/27/1995 Referred to
House Economic and Educational Opportunities01/04/1995 Referred to
House Budget01/04/1995 Referred to
House Rules01/04/1995 Referred to
House Commerce01/04/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment01/13/1995 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power01/13/1995 Referred to
House Judiciary01/04/1995 Referred to
House Agriculture01/04/1995 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Nutrition and Foreign Agriculture01/20/1995 Referred to
Senate Finance03/29/1995 Referred to
04/27/1995 Hearings by
05/26/1995 Markup by
06/09/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-96