Committees: H.R.2491 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations01/25/1993 Referred to
06/22/1993 Markup by
06/22/1993 Reported original measure H.Rept 103-150
House Appropriations Subcommittee on VA, HUD, and Independent Agencies03/25/1993 Referred to
05/07/1993 Hearings by
05/27/1993 Markup by
Senate Appropriations07/13/1993 Referred to
09/09/1993 Markup by
09/09/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-137
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on VA, HUD, and Independent Agencies09/08/1993 Markup by
09/08/1993 Reported by