There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mammography Quality Standards Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

Mammography Quality Standards Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish the authority for the regulation of mammography services and radiological equipment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 390 - 18 (Roll No. 424).
09/22/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-889.
09/15/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/08/1992SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
09/30/1992SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/24/1992-1:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/24/1992-1:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 390 - 18 (Roll No. 424).
09/24/1992-1:45pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
09/22/1992-10:41pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Sept. 23.
09/22/1992-10:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/22/1992-10:24pmHousePoint of order raised by Mr. Dannemeyer against consideration of the Measure. Mr. Dannemeyer stated that the Committee on Energy and Commerce acted on the bill without the presence of a quorum, in violation of the rules of the House. Point of order overruled by the Chair.
09/22/1992-10:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
09/22/1992-10:21pmHouseMr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/22/1992HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 505.
09/22/1992HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-889.
09/17/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/17/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/15/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/15/1992HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/15/1992 Referred to
09/17/1992 Markup by
09/22/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-889
Senate Labor and Human Resources10/08/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5938. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/24/1992)

Mammography Quality Standards Act of 1992 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require certification (or provisional certification) in order for a facility to perform or interpret mammograms, inspect equipment, or provide for the processing of mammography film. Authorizes the Secretary of Health and Human Services to issue and renew certificates for a specified period of time.

Allows the Secretary to approve a private nonprofit organization or State agency to be an accreditation body if it meets certain standards and provides certain assurances.

Mandates standards to assure the safety and accuracy of mammograms, including regarding: (1) quality assurance and control programs; (2) radiation doses; (3) equipment used; (4) licensing, certification, and training of personnel; and (5) recordkeeping and retention.

Directs the Secretary to conduct annual inspections of certified facilities. Requires, subject to waiver, 48 hours notice of inspections.

Provides for: (1) directed plans of correction, on site monitoring costs payment, and civil money penalties; (2) suspension, revocation, and limitation of certificates; and (3) injunctions. Limits State inspection fees to the costs of conducting the inspections.

Requires annual publication of a list of facilities convicted of fraud and abuse, false billings, or kickbacks, facilities that have had certificates revoked, suspended, or limited, and facilities that have been the subject of a sanction or other similar matters.

Establishes the National Mammography Quality Assurance Advisory Committee.

Mandates grants to establish surveillance systems to evaluate breast cancer screening programs.

Authorizes appropriations to carry out this Act.