Text: H.R.3313 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House

 
 
Union Calendar No. 201
102d CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3313
[Report No. 102-339]
A BILL
Extending nondiscriminatory treatment (most-favored-nation treatment) to
the products of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania, and for other purposes.
November 19, 1991
Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and
ordered to be printed
HR 3313 RH
Union Calendar No. 201
102d CONGRESS
1st Session
 H. R. 3313
[Report No. 102-339]
Extending nondiscriminatory treatment (most-favored-nation treatment) to
the products of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania, and for other purposes.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
September 12, 1991
Mr. GIBBONS (for himself, Mr. JENKINS, Mr. PEASE, Mr. SCHULZE, Mr. ANTHONY,
Mr. COYNE, Mrs. JOHNSON of Connecticut, Mr. MCEWEN, Mr. MOODY, Mrs. SCHROEDER,
Mr. BILBRAY, Mr. FEIGHAN, and Mr. BUSTAMANTE) introduced the following bill;
which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
November 19, 1991
Additional sponsors: Mr. DORNAN of California, Mr. TRAXLER, Mr. BEREUTER,
Mr. SMITH of New Jersey, Mr. CRANE, Mr. GUARINI, Mr. CHANDLER, Mr. HOYER,
Mr. GEJDENSON, and Mr. Ritter
November 19, 1991
Committed to the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and
ordered to be printed
A BILL
Extending nondiscriminatory treatment (most-favored-nation treatment) to
the products of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania, and for other purposes.
  Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United
  States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. CONGRESSIONAL FINDINGS.
  The Congress finds the following:
  (1) The Government of the United States extended full diplomatic recognition
  to Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania in 1922.
  (2) The Government of the United States entered into agreements extending
  most-favored-nation treatment with the Government of Estonia on August 1,
  1925, the Government of Latvia on April 30, 1926, and the Government of
  Lithuania on July 10, 1926.
  (3) The Union of Soviet Socialist Republics incorporated Estonia, Latvia,
  and Lithuania involuntarily into the Union as a result of a secret protocol
  to a German-Soviet agreement in 1939 which assigned those three states to
  the Soviet sphere of influence; and the Government of the United States
  has at no time recognized the forcible incorporation of those states into
  the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics.
  (4) The Trade Agreements Extension Act of 1951 required the President to
  suspend, withdraw, or prevent the application of trade benefits, including
  most-favored-nation treatment, to countries under the domination or control
  of the world Communist movement.
  (5) In 1951, responsible representatives of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania
  stated that they did not object to the imposition of `such controls as
  the Government of the United States may consider to be appropriate' to
  the products of those countries, for such time as those countries remained
  under Soviet domination or control.
  (6) In 1990, the democratically elected governments of Estonia, Latvia,
  and Lithuania declared the restoration of their independence from the
  Union of Soviet Socialist Republics.
  (7) The Government of the United States established diplomatic relations
  with Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania on September 2, 1991, and on September
  6, 1991, the State Council of the transitional government of the Union of
  Soviet Socialist Republics recognized the independence of Estonia, Latvia,
  and Lithuania, thereby ending the involuntary incorporation of those
  countries into, and the domination of those countries by, the Soviet Union.
  (8) Immediate action should be taken to remove the impediments, imposed in
  response to the circumstances referred to in paragraph (5), in United
  States trade laws to the extension of nondiscriminatory treatment
  (most-favored-nation treatment) to the products of those countries.
  (9) As a consequence of establishment of United States diplomatic relations
  with Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania, these independent countries are
  eligible to receive the benefits of the Generalized System of Preferences
  provided for in title V of the Trade Act of 1974.
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF NONDISCRIMINATORY TREATMENT TO THE PRODUCTS OF ESTONIA,
LATVIA, AND LITHUANIA.
  (a) IN GENERAL- Notwithstanding any provision of title IV of the Trade
  Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2431 et seq.) or any other provision of law,
  nondiscriminatory treatment (most-favored-nation treatment) applies to
  the products of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania.
  (b) CONFORMING TARIFF SCHEDULE AMENDMENTS- General Note 3(b) of the
  Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States is amended by striking out
  `Estonia', `Latvia', and `Lithuania'.
  (c) EFFECTIVE DATE- Subsection (a) and the amendments made by subsection
  (b) apply with respect to goods entered, or withdrawn from warehouse for
  consumption, on or after the 15th day after the date of the enactment of
  this Act.
SEC. 3. TERMINATION OF APPLICATION OF TITLE IV OF THE TRADE ACT OF 1974 TO
THE BALTICS.
  Title IV of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2431 et seq.) shall cease
  to apply to Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania effective as of the 15th day
  after the date of the enactment of this Act.
SEC. 4. SENSE OF THE CONGRESS REGARDING PROMPT PROVISION OF GSP TREATMENT
TO THE PRODUCTS OF ESTONIA, LATVIA, AND LITHUANIA.
  It is the sense of the Congress that the President should take prompt action
  under title V of the Trade Act of 1974 to provide preferential tariff
  treatment to the products of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania pursuant to
  the Generalized System of Preferences.