Summary: S.Res.66 — 101st Congress (1989-1990)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.Res.66. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/23/1989)

Omnibus Committee Funding Resolution for 1989 and 1990 - Authorizes expenditures by the following Senate committees from March 1, 1989, through February 28, 1990, and for the period March 1, 1990, through February 28, 1991: (1) Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry; (2) Appropriations; (3) Armed Services; (4) Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs; (5) Budget; (6) Commerce, Science, and Transportation; (7) Energy and Natural Resources; (8) Environment and Public Works; (9) Finance; (10) Foreign Relations; (11) Governmental Affairs; (12) Judiciary; (13) Labor and Human Resources; (14) Rules and Administration; (15) Small Business; (16) Veterans' Affairs; (17) Aging; (18) Intelligence; and (19) Indian Affairs.

Authorizes the transfer of any unexpended balance of any committee to a special reserve to assist such committee during the transition to a biennial budget.

Repeals S. Res. 458, 100th Congress, which provided for managing the expenditure of funds for Senate official mail for FY 1989.

Establishes a formula for determining the number of pieces of mail which may be mailed as franked mail by Senators.