There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to amend title 35, United States Code, with respect to the use of inventions in outer space.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 35, United States Code, and the National Aeronautics and Space Act of 1958, with respect to the use of inventions in outer space.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/15/1990Became Public Law No: 101-580.
11/15/1990Signed by President.
11/09/1990Presented to President.
10/26/1990Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
10/26/1990Committee on Judiciary discharged.
05/01/1990Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
04/19/1990Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 101-266.
02/28/1989Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/15/1990Became Public Law No: 101-580.
11/15/1990Signed by President.
11/09/1990SenatePresented to President.
11/09/1990SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/26/1990-9:19pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 2946 was laid on the table without objection.
10/26/1990-9:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/26/1990-9:18pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/26/1990-9:17pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent.
10/26/1990-9:17pmHouseMr. Kastenmeier asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/26/1990HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
05/04/1990HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/03/1990HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
05/03/1990-12:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/03/1990SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/01/1990SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
04/19/1990SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 510.
04/19/1990SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 101-266.
03/22/1990SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/26/1989SenateSubcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks
03/13/1989SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/28/1989SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/28/1989 Referred to
03/22/1990 Markup by
04/19/1990 Reported by S.Rept 101-266
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Patents, Copyrights and Trademarks03/13/1989 Referred to
07/26/1989 Markup by
07/26/1989 Reported by
House Judiciary05/03/1990 Referred to
10/26/1990 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Administration of Justice05/04/1990 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.459.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.459. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/01/1990)

Amends Federal patent law to provide that any invention made, used, or sold in outer space on a space object or component under the jurisdiction or control of the United States shall be considered made, used, or sold within the United States unless: (1) it has been specifically identified and provided for in an international agreement which the United States has signed; or (2) it is carried on the registry of a foreign state in accordance with the Convention on Registration of Objects Launched into Outer Space. Declares that any invention carried on such registry shall be considered made, used, or sold within the United States if specifically so agreed in an international agreement between the United States and the state of registry.